Financial history RATEPAYERS LANDS

Charity number: 214669
Charity reporting is overdue by 1288 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.39k £1.39k £1.44k £1.46k £441
Total expenditure £1.08k £1.00k £1.00k £1.30k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A