Financial history BIRMINGHAM TEMPERANCE SOCIETY'S MEMORIAL AND GIFT TRUST

Charity number: 215156
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £3.64k £23.16k £3.91k £3.71k £9.86k
Total expenditure £807 £292 £1.67k £7.58k £9.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A