Charity overview CHARITY FOR THE REPAIR OF SIR JOHN SIMEON'S VAULT
Charity Number: 250881-8
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 28 JUNE 1861 AS AMENDED BY DETERMINATION ORDER 8 JULY 1904, SCHEME OF 10 AUGUST 1970 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION (UNDER S. 74 CHARITIES ACT 1993) 16 MAY 2000
Charitable objects
KEEPING IN PROPER REPAIR THE VAULT OF SIR JOHN SIMEON IN THE CHURCH OF ST. GILES.
Area of benefit
READING.
Registration history
- 29 April 1968: Standard registration
- 13 February 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.