Accounts and annual returns JOHN JEFFREYS

Charity number: 216360
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 19 October 2010 353 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 14 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required