Financial history EDWARD HERON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 216855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £11.16k £13.21k £12.62k £13.63k £12.52k
Total expenditure £32.02k £27.48k £22.17k £11.02k £12.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A