REVEREND JOHN ASHTON'S CHARITY (ESTATE TRUSTEES)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity relates to a peppercorn rent attached to some older properties in the parish and dates back several hundred years hence the small amounts involved. The money collected is distributed between the Vicar of Ipstones; the School Trustees and the pensioners of the parish. Because of the small amounts involved the money collected is distributed every 3 or 4 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 29 October 1963: Standard registration
- REVEREND JOHN ASHTONS CHARITY AND OTHERS (Working name)
- WILLIAM ADAMS REG NO 230342 (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael David Birch | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Hallam | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Thomas Michael Irwin | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Leslie John Jackson | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Brian Snow | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather James | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Ipstones Parish Council | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANET MAY CHADWICK | Trustee |
|
||||||
LINDA ANN MALYON | Trustee |
|
||||||
PATRICK STIMPSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANDREW WEST STEVENSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 16061988
Charitable objects
YEARLY SUMS OF $3 TO THE VICAR OF EDALE AND $1 TO THE VICAR OF IPSTONES AND TO LOCAL TRUSTEES YEARLY SUMS FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS WITH RESIDUE FOR PURCHASE OF ENGLISH BIBLES, PRAYER BOOKS OR CHURCH CATECHISMS AND DIVIDED AMONGST INCUMBENTS AND CHURCHWARDENS EXERCISING JURISDICTION OVER ABOVE DISTRICT FOR DISTRIBUTION TO THE POOR.
Area of benefit
EDALE, IPSTONES, ALTRINCHAM, CALTON, CROXDEN, SHEEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 FROGHALL ROAD
IPSTONES
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST10 2NA
- Phone:
- 01538266720
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window