Accounts and annual returns HAVANT AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 217168
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 12 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 28 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 28 September 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 14 October 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 14 October 2004 On Time