Financial history CHARITY OF JOHN COWPER (OR COOPER)

Charity Number: 217402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £101 £235 £250 £0 £5
Total expenditure £200 £200 £150 £0 £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A