Accounts and annual returns THE STOTTESDON CHARITY FOR POOR

Charity Number: 217525
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 03 March 2008 397 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 30 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required