Accounts and annual returns THOMAS UNDERWOOD'S CHARITY

Charity number: 217567
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2006 05 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 14 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 09 March 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required