Accounts and annual returns MISS EMILY AUGUSTA SEVERN

Charity number: 218175
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 21 October 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 21 October 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 21 October 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 21 October 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 21 October 2010 12 July 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 21 October 2010 Not Required
Annual return 21 October 2009 19 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 21 October 2009 Not Required