Accounts and annual returns SIR EDMUND TURNOR'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 218766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 July 2024 269 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 July 2024 269 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 November 2022 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 November 2022 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 November 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 December 2021 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 November 2020 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 December 2020 44 days late Download Open in new window