Accounts and annual returns UPPER GORNAL PENSIONERS CLUB

Charity number: 219024
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 February 2024 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 January 2022 340 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required