Financial history CHESHIRE FREEMASONS' CHARITY

Charity number: 219177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £408.38k £328.60k £469.20k £782.54k £601.98k
Total expenditure £293.18k £258.25k £644.43k £830.50k £659.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £607.76k £451.37k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £7.49k £3.90k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £167.28k £146.72k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £5.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £794.97k £632.87k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £23.16k £22.88k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £32.04k £26.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £762.93k £606.46k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £23.16k £22.88k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £12.37k £4.07k