Trustees CHESHIRE MASONIC TRUSTEE CORPORATION LIMITED

Charity number: 219181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Robert Crudge Chair 16 October 2019
CHESHIRE MASONIC COVENANTS LIMITED
Received: On time
CHESHIRE FREEMASONS' CHARITY
Received: On time
Neil Arthur Willis Trustee 06 November 2024
CHESHIRE MASONIC COVENANTS LIMITED
Received: On time
CHESHIRE FREEMASONS' CHARITY
Received: On time
Jeffrey Cunningham Trustee 04 December 2023
CHESHIRE FREEMASONS' CHARITY
Received: On time
CHESHIRE MASONIC COVENANTS LIMITED
Received: On time
Michael George Leese Trustee 31 January 2022
CHESHIRE MASONIC COVENANTS LIMITED
Received: On time
DENNIS TALBOT Trustee 17 August 2018
CHESHIRE MASONIC COVENANTS LIMITED
Received: On time
CHESHIRE FREEMASONS' CHARITY
Received: On time