Accounts and annual returns FRANCES PAYNE

Charity Number: 219242
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 22 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 30 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required