Accounts and annual returns BRITISH LEGION - WEST BRIDGFORD SERVICE FUND

Charity number: 219456
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2004 08 September 2005 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required