Financial history ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF ELIZABETH BUXTON

Charity number: 219573
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011
Total gross income £1.45k £17 £17 £17 £24
Total expenditure £2.00k £20 £20 £20 £20
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A