Accounts and annual returns PEAT MOSSES OR TURBARIES

Charity Number: 219844
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 05 February 2010 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 08 June 2009 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required