Financial history SHREWLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 219917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.44k £21.45k £24.29k £29.04k £19.37k
Total expenditure £9.87k £9.68k £12.61k £13.20k £25.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £16.34k £12.50k £1.81k