Financial history SANDOWN MASONIC LODGE NO 1869 (BENEVOLENT FUND )

Charity Number: 220082
Charity reporting is overdue by 1659 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £3.45k £4.61k £4.83k £3.48k £2.33k
Total expenditure £3.80k £3.94k £6.19k £2.19k £1.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A