Accounts and annual returns WALLSEND MEMORIAL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 220149
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 16 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 16 January 2012 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2010 02 February 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 02 February 2011 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2009 14 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 28 February 2010 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2008 17 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 17 February 2009 On Time