Financial history CHARITY OF MARY SIMMS DAVIDSON

Charity number: 221102
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 14/09/2005 14/09/2006 14/09/2007 14/09/2008 14/09/2009
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £890 £340
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £500 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A