Accounts and annual returns CHARITIES OF MARY AND ELIZABETH BECKETT FOR THE POOR

Charity Number: 221967
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 03 February 2012 825 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 31 January 2012 822 days late
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not submitted