Accounts and annual returns WILLIAM AND ANNE BARBOUR CHARITY

Charity number: 222401
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 09 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 05 July 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted