Accounts and annual returns THE HAMILTON MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 223270
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 22 April 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 21 February 2015 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 09 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 23 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required