Accounts and annual returns THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ST JAMES' HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY

Charity Number: 223379
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2005 07 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2005 07 October 2005 On Time
Annual return 29 February 2004 16 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2004 16 July 2004 On Time