Charity overview THOMAS DEWE FOR THE POOR
Charity number: 257234-3
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 20 MAY 1974 AND 18 APRIL 1983
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF LONGWORTH, CHARNEY BASSETT AND THE FORMER PARISH OF DRAYCOTT MOOR AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 31 MARCH 1971 WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. PRIOR TO SCHEME OF 20/5/1974 REGISTERED UNDER 257235
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Registration history
- 18 November 1968: Standard registration
- 20 August 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.