Accounts and annual returns JANE FISHER'S GIFT

Charity number: 224077
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 October 2007 26 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 02 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 03 October 2006 22 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 October 2006 Not Required
Annual return 04 October 2005 27 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 October 2005 Not Required
Annual return 05 October 2004 13 April 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2004 Not Required