Financial history THE PELHAM CHARITY TRUST

Charity Number: 224435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £7.52k £5.81k £6.75k £7.25k £7.74k
Total expenditure £4.05k £5.04k £2.55k £2.61k £6.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A