Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF NEWCASTLE GENERAL HOSPITAL
Charity Number: 225953
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2010 | 14 January 2011 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2010 | 14 January 2011 | 17 days late | |
Annual return | 28 February 2009 | 19 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2009 | 19 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 29 February 2008 | 16 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2008 | 16 December 2008 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window