Financial history THE DAVISON TRUST FOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 226430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.31k £72 £2 £456 £8.30k
Total expenditure £15.26k £7.71k £11.60k £14.36k £22.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A