Trustees THE FRIENDS OF THE WISBECH HOSPITALS
Charity number: 226983

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM BRUCE | Chair | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Susan HATCHER | Trustee | 03 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
William WHITE | Trustee | 03 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sue Bellamy | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Powell | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA BEALES | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN BEALES | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
GILL STEVENS | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
WENDY SMITH | Trustee | 24 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
SALLY BRUCE | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE MAGUIRE | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
NELLY TILBROOK | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAT BARBER | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.