Financial history THE ATHENE LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 227174
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £1.25k £650 £742 £791 £824
Total expenditure £850 £850 £750 £900 £850
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A