Accounts and annual returns BURNLEY SOCIAL CENTRES FOR OVER SIXTIES MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 227404
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 27 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 26 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 31 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 24 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 24 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 13 February 2006 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 13 February 2006 13 days late