Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL INSTITUTE OF PUBLIC HEALTH
Charity number: 227746
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 26 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 26 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 19 March 2010 | 139 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 19 March 2010 | 139 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 05 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | 25 July 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 17 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 04 October 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 02 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 02 October 2006 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window