Accounts and annual returns RELATE NORTH AND SOUTH WEST SUSSEX MARRIAGE GUIDANCE

Charity number: 227758
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 17 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 04 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 19 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 29 July 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 13 October 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 25 February 2005 25 days late