Trustees VICTORY HALL

Charity number: 227978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julian Smith Chair 01 January 2015
None on record
HELEN OMAN Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
David Richards Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Linda Short Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
ALAN ETHERIDGE Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
Christopher Pierpoint Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record
HELEN MOURDANT Trustee 22 August 2015
None on record
Barry McConway Trustee 01 January 2011
None on record
Tony Musgrave Trustee 01 April 2005
None on record
SIMON GREENWOOD Trustee
None on record
WILL GIBSON Trustee
None on record