Accounts and annual returns WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - KIRKBY FLEETHAM

Charity number: 228841
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 16 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 16 December 2008 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2006 09 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2005 14 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 24 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required