Trustees THE COUNTY FEDERATION OF WOMENS INSTITUTES, ISLE OF WIGHT
Charity number: 228856

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN BISS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Georgina Mary Moon | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Reed | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carys Gladdish | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Singleton | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Breach | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Lindsay Rowlands | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Jones | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY ORMEROD MASKELL MBE | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE ANNE ANDREW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS LIZ GROVES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.