Financial history TOWNSEND MEMORIAL HALL (THE VILLAGE HALL AND COTTAGE)

Charity Number: 228878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.60k £26.13k £29.61k £23.86k £14.05k
Total expenditure £28.52k £12.37k £12.74k £14.85k £24.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.10k £16.38k £6.55k N/A