Financial history THE ENGLISH TRUSTS OF THE CONGREGATION OF THE SACRED HEARTS AND OF PERPETUAL ADORATION

Charity number: 229050
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/01/2010
Total gross income £540.12k £281.77k £268.68k £613.24k £632.41k
Total expenditure £732.21k £348.31k £495.70k £203.31k £234.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £102.55k £12.42k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £218.70k £135.18k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £292.00k £484.81k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £176.73k £213.67k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £8.05k £12.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £70.68k £107.08k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £18.53k £8.26k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0