Financial history SOCIETY FOR THE RELIEF OF WIDOWS AND ORPHANS OF SHIPWRECKED MARINERS

Charity number: 229235
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 30/01/2009
Total gross income £6.05k £6.10k £6.52k £6.92k £19.03k
Total expenditure £2.70k £9.09k £3.12k £6.54k £6.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A