Financial history LAUNCELLS VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 229876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.85k £19.94k £19.20k £14.36k £12.62k
Total expenditure £8.51k £3.00k £14.53k £9.07k £27.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.60k £10.67k N/A N/A