Financial history THE METCHLEY TRUST

Charity Number: 230580
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £3.60k £3.71k £3.91k £4.16k £4.34k
Total expenditure £3.40k £1.95k £4.70k £2.95k £3.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A