Accounts and annual returns COPPULL LODGE NO 4232 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 230633
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2005 24 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 02 August 2004 On Time