Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - STANLEY BRANCH

Charity number: 231600
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 January 2018 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required