Financial history RYCROFT CHILDREN'S FUND

Charity number: 231771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £37.08k £82.04k £36.04k £14.23k £38.86k
Total expenditure £51.34k £50.42k £107.38k £52.07k £48.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A