Accounts and annual returns ROSA HOVEY HOUSING TRUST

Charity number: 232071
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 October 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 June 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 August 2020 On Time