Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF EMILY BURNABY

Charity number: 232120
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2011 22 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 20 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 25 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 02 November 2009 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required